Financial history THE BELIEVE AND ACHIEVE TRUST

Charity number: 1157173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £30.09k £24.73k £18.91k £22.11k £17.23k
Total expenditure £26.58k £27.09k £20.44k £22.92k £11.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A