Financial history GARW VALLEY LINKS

Charity number: 1157736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £9.44k £12.07k £12.65k £15.36k £14.03k
Total expenditure £10.94k £11.78k £9.91k £13.59k £13.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A