THE CO-MISSION INITIATIVE TRUST

Charity number: 1157383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 18 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 13 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 20 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 20 March 2017 On time Download