Financial history WARWICKSHIRE AND SOLIHULL BLOOD BIKES

Charity number: 1156751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £81.47k £76.17k £61.21k £89.72k £89.72k
Total expenditure £61.31k £61.31k £43.94k £73.62k £73.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A