Trustees WARWICKSHIRE AND SOLIHULL BLOOD BIKES
Charity number: 1156751

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Hewitson | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phil MacRae | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Phillip Smith | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Mason | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Barber | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Whitehill Houston | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Daniel O'Brien | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Grigg | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard William Brown | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.