CRISIS AID

Charity number: 1157507
Charity reporting is overdue by 77 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 77 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 77 days
Annual return 31 May 2019 13 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 13 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2017 On time Download