CRISIS AID

Charity number: 1157507
Charity reporting is overdue by 75 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £249.74k £161.14k £534.34k £978.33k £2.15m
Total expenditure £119.07k £136.03k £334.95k £643.32k £1.54m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £532.84k £77.33k £2.06m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £901.00k £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £1.50k £0 £83.75k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £334.95k £643.32k £1.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £136.96k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £9.42k