EVERYBODY SPORT & RECREATION

Charity number: 1156084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARTIN CHRISTOPHER HARDY Trustee 17 February 2014
EVERYBODY FOUNDATION Received: 58 days late
ALEX TAYLOR Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
COLIN CHAYTORS Trustee 17 February 2014 None on record
ZOE DAVIDSON Trustee 10 March 2014 None on record
Suzie Akers-Smith Trustee 10 July 2019 None on record
Kimiyo Rickett Trustee 10 April 2018
EVERYBODY FOUNDATION Received: 58 days late
HARRY KORKOU Trustee 10 March 2014 None on record
PHILIP JACKSON BLAND MBE Trustee 17 February 2014
HOPE THROUGH ACTION Received: On time
EVERYBODY FOUNDATION Received: 58 days late
THE CHARLIE HARRISON FOUNDATION Received: On time
Christopher Gee Trustee 24 October 2019 None on record
RICHARD MIDDLEBROOK Trustee 10 March 2014
ALSAGER SCHOOL TRUST Received: On time
ANDREW MICHAEL JAMES KOLKER Chair 17 February 2014 None on record