3RD HARROGATE (ST JOHNS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 504512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 24 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 26 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 14 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 14 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 03 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required