3RD HARROGATE (ST JOHNS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 504512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £24.88k £28.37k £22.50k £37.69k £12.24k
Total expenditure £20.60k £27.96k £26.29k £25.83k £12.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £10.00k £9.43k