THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, BECONTREE

Charity number: 1157461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Brook Trustee 25 March 2018 None on record
Catherina Amber Rowland Trustee 04 October 2020 None on record
JIM HAGGER Trustee 25 March 2018 None on record
William Philip Miller Trustee 04 October 2020 None on record
Sylvia Patricia Brooks Trustee 05 April 2019 None on record
LISA MARY GROVES Trustee 04 October 2020
CHELMSFORD CURSILLO Received: On time
Rev Kathryn Miller Chair 26 July 2018 None on record
Dr olajumokie okoya Trustee 05 April 2019 None on record
Oluwakemi Ademosu-Jaiyeola Trustee 05 April 2019 None on record
LEIGH TRACY DOWLING Trustee 09 April 2017 None on record
CECILIA ESI MORKEH-YAMSON PELLIGRIN Trustee 09 April 2017
DISCET (UK) Received: On time
Rev Timothy Robert Harry Broadbent Trustee 04 October 2020 None on record
Cliff McLeod Trustee 25 March 2018 None on record
Denver Pieterse Trustee 25 March 2018 None on record
Sheila Lammin Trustee 25 March 2018 None on record
KATHY HARVEY Trustee 09 April 2017 None on record
Emilia Tejuoso Trustee 04 October 2020 None on record