Accounts and annual returns GREEN MAN TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1156453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window