Financial history GREEN MAN TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1156453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £110.16k £106.37k £124.29k £152.64k £347.42k
Total expenditure £85.70k £102.12k £123.96k £138.47k £127.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £74.39k £56.98k £55.00k £19.60k N/A