HURSTBOURNE TARRANT COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1156307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £153.13k £35.33k £28.32k £28.00k £27.62k
Total expenditure £17.26k £12.23k £17.49k £17.33k £12.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £75.00k £0 £0 N/A £10.00k