Accounts and annual returns HORSTED SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1156232
Charity reporting is overdue by 691 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 326 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 326 days
Annual return 01 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 691 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 691 days
Annual return 01 September 2020 25 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 25 March 2021 267 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2018 Not Required