Financial history HORSTED SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1156232
Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2016 01/09/2017 01/09/2018 01/09/2019 01/09/2020
Total gross income £22.55k £16.05k £18.24k £15.12k £9.25k
Total expenditure £8.43k £16.23k £15.09k £7.39k £3.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A