Accounts and annual returns COPELAND ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED
Charity number: 504535
Charity reporting is overdue by 1643 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 182 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 182 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 547 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 547 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 912 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 912 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1277 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1277 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1643 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1643 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window