EMPIRE FIGHTING CHANCE

Charity number: 1156690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 30 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 09 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 09 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 27 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 27 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 25 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2015 19 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 19 July 2016 On time Download