THE EARDSTAPA TRUST

Charity number: 1156221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 09 February 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 09 February 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required