FYLDE FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1157247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £49.63k £58.39k £103.20k £87.55k £158.51k
Total expenditure £48.12k £50.24k £58.26k £78.53k £114.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A