FYLDE FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1157247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LINDA NULTY NNEB Trustee 31 March 2014 None on record
BERNARD ARMSTRONG BSC ENG Trustee 31 March 2014 None on record
Louise Elizabeth Chase BDS Trustee 27 October 2021 None on record
Elaine Mary Gladstone Trustee 08 September 2021 None on record
Rev Jim Williams Trustee 27 February 2019 None on record
Kenneth James Rushton Trustee 11 December 2014 None on record
KIM COOK Chair 31 March 2014 None on record