THE CHALCOT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1157036
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 02 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 02 February 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)