THE CHALCOT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1157036
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £375.00k £137 £0 £0 £12.27k
Total expenditure £221.46k £214.03k £25.70k £109.05k £14.29k