Financial history BROADFIELD YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1156601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £155.09k £154.19k £133.20k £139.22k £151.56k
Total expenditure £122.97k £138.22k £136.46k £96.17k £124.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £56.87k £38.73k £38.00k £60.94k £54.76k