AL HIKMAH LEARNING CENTRE

Charity number: 1157165
Charity reporting is up to date (98 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2016 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020
Total gross income £64.28k £68.58k £81.81k £146.68k £151.84k
Total expenditure £32.15k £46.03k £60.34k £60.47k £75.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A