DREAM BIG GHANA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £21.34k £34.80k £97.60k £70.47k £85.35k
Total expenditure £26.97k £24.15k £67.41k £62.15k £64.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A