DREAM BIG GHANA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr LINDA EAST Trustee 11 March 2014 None on record
Ama Williams Trustee 28 June 2020
DEVON WILDLIFE TRUST Received: On time
Bryan Pearson Chair 13 September 2020
THE BLOOD CARE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Charles French Trustee 19 November 2017 None on record
Dominic Bride Trustee 03 November 2019 None on record
Renette Marquis Trustee 26 July 2021 None on record
Barnaby David King Trustee 31 January 2019 None on record