Accounts and annual returns GOODWIN HALL

Charity number: 504585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required