Financial history GOODWIN HALL

Charity number: 504585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £19.52k £13.29k £11.20k £16.70k £23.76k
Total expenditure £16.89k £9.56k £11.98k £10.30k £18.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £19.96k