Financial history REDBOURN U3A

Charity number: 1156462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £19.08k £14.98k £23.29k £18.87k £5.35k
Total expenditure £18.92k £17.28k £22.30k £16.50k £5.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A