Trustees REDBOURN U3A

Charity number: 1156462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sigrid McFadyen Chair 19 June 2019
None on record
Valerie Brown mrs Trustee 21 November 2021
None on record
Christine Aitkin mrs Trustee 12 September 2021
None on record
Jill Freeman mrs Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Valerie Patricia Churchhouse Mrs. Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Barry Welch Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Margaret Scarborough mrs Trustee 21 March 2020
None on record
DIANE WHISKIN Trustee 18 March 2014
None on record
ANNE FINNIS Trustee 18 March 2014
None on record