Financial history PHELIX RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1156666
Charity reporting is overdue by 565 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £66.65k £42.23k £78.38k £59.50k £96.06k
Total expenditure £66.65k £42.24k £78.40k £59.50k £114.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A