BITE SIZE PIECES

Charity number: 1156326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 10 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 10 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required