BITE SIZE PIECES

Charity number: 1156326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £12.66k £163 £59 £133 £115
Total expenditure £8.18k £7.09k £6.91k £13.56k £10.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A