COMMONWEALTH COUNTRIES LEAGUE

Charity number: 1159625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £101.98k £50.87k £39.49k £56.29k £57.09k
Total expenditure £52.13k £72.25k £37.61k £66.45k £50.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A