WOOLWICH COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1157291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 30/05/2017 30/05/2018 30/05/2019 30/05/2020
Total gross income £76.79k £68.82k £97.63k £120.94k £120.94k
Total expenditure £71.40k £46.72k £69.31k £69.48k £51.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A