THE HOLY CHURCH OF GOD LONDON

Charity number: 1156907
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.21k £3.58k £3.46k £5.57k £7.44k
Total expenditure £3.61k £4.09k £3.58k £3.36k £5.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A