MRKH CONNECT

Charity number: 1157477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £1.39k £403 £573 £6.26k £7.90k
Total expenditure £1.71k £8.59k £138 £498 £3.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A