READING UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1158523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £6.04m £6.52m £5.43m £5.41m £4.38m
Total expenditure £5.78m £6.25m £4.97m £5.18m £4.94m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £1.57m N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.13m £1.25m £1.62m £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £73.56k £372.20k £435.45k £460.75k £281.54k
Income - Charitable activities £4.83m £4.89m £3.37m £3.37m £2.36m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.97k £3.40k £4.81k £10.06k £10.57k
Income - Other £1.80k £244 £832 £3.47k £1.73m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.74m £5.54m £4.32m £4.56m £3.93m
Expenditure - Raising funds £35.49k £370.14k £515.30k £589.15k £499.49k
Expenditure - Governance £124.54k £197.51k £145.14k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £344.01k £128.50k £38.86k £515.21k