Financial history RISE:61

Charity number: 1158086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £70.73k £36.59k £47.87k £53.25k £115.48k
Total expenditure £48.28k £48.41k £48.39k £46.80k £93.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.70k £300 £3.00k N/A £27.65k