HAMSTERLEY AND LOW WESTWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.22k £6.63k £6.69k £11.02k £13.29k
Total expenditure £5.31k £6.54k £10.75k £12.69k £4.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.00k £10.00k