RAINBOW PRE-SCHOOL & EXTENDED SERVICES

Charity number: 1158113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Rae Trustee 27 January 2015 None on record
PETER TEUMA Chair 29 October 2011 None on record
Deborah King Trustee 16 January 2014 None on record
Julia Khan Trustee 28 January 2013 None on record
Joanne Norman Trustee 03 March 2017 None on record