CUMBRIA FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS - NORTHERN DISTRICT

Charity number: 504832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £40.44k £42.68k £44.60k £28.12k £9.75k
Total expenditure £33.83k £35.51k £41.71k £36.58k £20.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A