FRIENDS OF HARPENDEN ACADEMY

Charity number: 1159562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £26.08k £24.03k £65.70k £29.68k £16.83k
Total expenditure £24.80k £24.86k £99.09k £22.87k £20.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £2.50k N/A N/A