THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN, WINDERMERE

Charity number: 1161992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 16 May 2017 On time Download