Financial history ST MARGARET'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1160900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £230.73k £276.52k £235.81k £247.52k £266.85k
Total expenditure £227.20k £266.15k £274.90k £264.88k £230.02k
Income from government contracts £163.81k £163.81k £163.81k £163.81k £163.81k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A