Accounts and annual returns PETERBOROUGH CATHEDRAL DEVELOPMENT AND PRESERVATION TRUST CIO

Charity number: 1159730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 May 2019 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 May 2019 106 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window