Financial history PETERBOROUGH CATHEDRAL DEVELOPMENT AND PRESERVATION TRUST CIO

Charity number: 1159730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £0 £12.16k £286.38k £123.11k £170.14k
Total expenditure £0 £105.34k £267.83k £225.09k £188.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £19.53k