Financial history ART WITH A HEART

Charity number: 1159034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/07/2017 01/07/2018 01/07/2019 01/07/2020 01/07/2021
Total gross income £10.93k £13.78k £12.12k £267 £248
Total expenditure £7.23k £15.46k £3.88k £1.63k £372
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.66k £3.96k N/A N/A N/A