Accounts and annual returns ART WITH A HEART

Charity number: 1159034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 July 2021 24 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2021 24 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 July 2020 02 May 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2020 02 May 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 July 2019 30 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2019 30 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 July 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2018 30 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 July 2017 23 June 2018 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2017 16 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window